Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
San Joaquin County, filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against West, Patricia, West, Howard D, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Humphreys, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHumphreys, Elizabeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2016 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time1027 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
CIV110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to San Joaquin County, Howard D West, Patricia West Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service of Summons as to Patricia West served on 09/08/2016 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service of Summons as to Howard D West served on 08/22/2016 by Substituted Service. $55.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case initiated.
Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Attorney, Andrew N. Eshoo, retained for San Joaquin County .
Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUM100 SUMMONS CIVIL FILED RECORD SEALED Summons issued and filed. Summons - Civil Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
CM010 CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED RECORD SEALED Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Joaquin County. Civil Case Cover Sheet Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICEOFCASEASSIGNMENT WITHOUTHEARING RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.