Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of Stockton, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Remy, Ronald, Remy, Carolyn Y., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Thomasson, Lauren presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2008 |
CategoryLimited Civil Business Tort/ Unfair Business Practice |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time4069 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Thomasson, Lauren |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of service of OEX filed as to[DEFT] Ronald Remy; by personal service on 7/26/07 at 7;58pm
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute Order of hearing calendared for October 4, 2007
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
MO: Hearing continued on court's motion New hearing date: 10/26/2007
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Bench warrant hearing For FTA @ OEX as to DEFT Carolyn Remy
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Bench warrant hearing For FTA @ OEX as to DEFT Ronald Remy
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed as to[DEFT] Carolyn Y. Remy; by personal service on 7/26/07 at 7:58pm
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
MO: Other predisposition hearing held. Ronald & Carolyn Remy sworn and retired w/ Counsel. OEX discharged, Judgment Debtor surrendered. Bench Warrant is recalled.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.