Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of San Joaquin, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Gresham, Tyronza N., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Family Law Annex with Unassigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2006 |
CategoryFamily Support Complaint |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseFamily Law Annex |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Unassigned |
|
August 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Entry of judgment after hearing
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Pro per defendant
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
MO: Motion hearing held - Initial
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion re child support
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOM - Child Support, Health Care and Back Child Support
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion - Initial
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Answer filed as to:[DEFT] TYRONZA N. GRESHAM;
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Income & expense declaration[DEFT] TYRONZA N. GRESHAM;
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.