Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Smith, Mary Ellen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Smith, Darin Jay, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Family Law Annex with McCann, Cheryl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcCann, Cheryl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution Without Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseFamily Law Annex |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Unassigned |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record filed by Smith, Darin Jay. Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record Judge: Unassigned |
|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Payment received in the amount of $26.50, receipt number 17683.
Judge: Unassigned |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record filed by Smith, Mary Ellen. Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record Judge: Unassigned |
|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulated Qualified Domestic Relations Order filed.
Judge: McCann, Cheryl A. |
|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Mary Ellen Smith in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 8582.
Judge: Unassigned |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment filed status terminated on 10/15/2015
Judge: Unassigned |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Family Law Judgment entered and filed.
Judge: Unassigned |
|
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Smith, Mary Ellen. Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation Judge: Unassigned |
|
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure filed by Smith, Mary Ellen. Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure Judge: Unassigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.