Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fanelli, Eileen, Mcconnell, Christopher, Tsou, Michelle, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Dollard, Jennifer V presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDollard, Jennifer V Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Special Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference cont from 6/4/21 for status of estate or final account and distribution Judge: Ornell, Lawrence E |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Other
Judge: Ornell, Lawrence E |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order to Continue Re:Discovery and hearing date; Joint Statement of Issues-Cont to 5-13-2022 |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Examiner Notes Hearing Date: 01/07/2022 |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order to Continue HRG 11/5/21 - Stipulation Re: Discovery and Hearing Date; Joint Statement of Issues |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Probate Examiner Notes | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Partial Inventory and Appraisal Partial No. 1 Inventory and Appraisal |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Petition for Orders Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to Reply to Petition for Orders |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Probate Examiner Notes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.