Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Thomas Lyons, Erin Lyons, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Paul C Smith, against Charles H. Clifford, Tara K. Callahan, represented by Denae Hildebrand Budde, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2018 | Action | EXHIBITS DESTROYED | |
March 09, 2018 | Action | EXHIBIT PICK-UP LETTER SENT | |
February 13, 2018 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 03/05/2018 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: DFCV IN DEPARTMENT: D25 DROP REASON: REQUESTED BY MOVING PARTY | |
February 09, 2018 | Action | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED. (FULL) BY ATTORNEY LESLIE BAXTER ON BEHALF OF ASSIGNEE OF RECORD AS TO JUDGMENT DEBTORS THOMAS LYONS AND ERIN LYONS | |
January 30, 2018 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 03/05/2018 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: DFCV IN DEPARTMENT: D25 | |
December 18, 2017 | Action | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT BY ATTORNEY DENAE HILDEBRAND BUDDE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS: DEFENDANTS AND JUDGMENT CREDITORS CHARLES H. CLIFFORN AND TARA K. CALLAHAN ACKNOWLEDGE ASSIGNMENT OF ALL INTEREST, RIGHT AND TITLE IN THE JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND JUDGMENT DEBTORS THOMAS LYONS AND ERIN LYONS TO STEWANT TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY (SEE FILE FOR COMPLETE TEXT) | |
November 20, 2017 | Action | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
October 27, 2017 | Action | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION BY ATTORNEY PAUL SMITH ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS THOMAS LYONS AND ERIN LYONS | |
October 05, 2017 | Action | TRIAL EXHIBITS TURNED OVER TO RECORDS MANAGEMENT. | |
September 19, 2017 | Action | COSTS APPLIED TO JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,042.00; JUDGMENT (FILED 08/14/17) TOTAL: $6,042.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.