Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Steven B Plumer, against Douglas C Dorsten, represented by Dario Bejarano, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Santa Maria - Miller - Criminal with No Assigned Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNo Assigned Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 1990 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Maria - Miller - Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 1995 | Hearing |
Probation Violation Hearing
Judge: Rodney S Melville |
|
March 08, 1995 | Hearing |
Probation Violation Hearing
Judge: Rodney S Melville |
|
March 08, 1995 | Action | Pre-SUSTAIN | |
February 24, 1995 | Hearing |
Probation Violation Hearing
Judge: Rodney S Melville |
|
February 24, 1995 | Action | Pre-SUSTAIN | |
February 23, 1995 | Action | Pre-SUSTAIN | |
September 21, 1990 | Action | New Filed Case | |
September 12, 1990 | Action | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.