Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Spirit Of The Sagecouncil, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate case against County Of San Bernardino, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Jeffrey King presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey King Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2002 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions385 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time385 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
January 16, 2003 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: CEQA PETITION FILED BY PETITIONER SPIRIT OF THE SAGECOUNCIL VACATED |
|
January 16, 2003 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: TO AUGMENT THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPIRIT OF THE SAGECOUNCIL VACATED |
|
January 13, 2003 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER DISMISSALS AND TRANSFERS Not Applicable |
|
January 13, 2003 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
January 13, 2003 | Docket Event |
COURT NOW RULES -- STAT CASE FOR 2C REPORT Not Applicable |
|
January 10, 2003 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R12 | |
January 10, 2003 | Docket Event |
HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 1/16/03 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT R20 - RESCHEDULED TO: Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.