Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Smith, Ashley C, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Freeland, Megan, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Paul Lozada presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul Lozada Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryRequest For Civil Harassment Restraining Orders |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Cont. from 9/21/21 to allow Respondent time to prepare Judge: Lozada, Paul James |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Filed Document | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment
Judge: Lozada, Paul James |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to Commissioner
Judge: Lozada, Paul James |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Restraining Order as of: OSC only |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Application For Waiver Of Court Fees & Costs | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.