Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Anderson, Bryan J., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Spahr, Chesterfield Adams, against National Entertainment Network, Llc, Safeway, Inc., represented by Aronov, Alexander M., Burke, Michael Shannon, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Honigsberg, Christopher M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHonigsberg, Christopher M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Anderson v. Safeway CMC stmt 2022.02.22
Date: February 07, 202255923SAFEW001c38
Date: April 07, 202255923Summo01c168
Date: April 07, 202256313Proof00cefe
Date: April 15, 202259065Answe00f94f
Date: June 15, 20222. Amendment to Complaint Naming DOE Def
Date: August 25, 20225. 2022.08.25 Proof of Service
Date: August 25, 20221. Ex Parte App for Order Naming DOE Def
Date: August 25, 20223. DECL iso Ex Parte App
Date: August 25, 20224. [Proposed] Order
Date: September 01, 2022Anderson -Notice of Entry of Order
Date: September 19, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: November 21, 2022ANDERSON Request for Dismissal (signed)
Date: January 24, 202370655Dismi0038b1
Date: February 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | 70655Dismi0038b1 | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ANDERSON Request for Dismissal (signed) | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal as to Pleading As to Complaint only |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 3-5 day JT Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Conditional Notice of Settlement Entire | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Anderson -Notice of Entry of Order | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Served | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | 4. [Proposed] Order | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order granting amendment to be filed naming Doe 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.