Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Williams, Dominique, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Malek, Jeffrey Leland, against Newlin, Nicholas Jon, represented by Jorgensen, Ken, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Broderick, Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBroderick, Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SCV_268106_Request_for_DIsmissal
Date: October 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 5 day JT Judge: Broderick, Patrick |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | SCV_268106_Request_for_DIsmissal | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial [trial only] |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of RULING |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Continued per 10/19/2021 Tentative Ruling [ Judge: Broderick, Patrick |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference trial setting Judge: Broderick, Patrick |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement LATE |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.