Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mann Bracken, Llp, against Linda Genelle Hill, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with John P. Wade presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn P. Wade Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management147 days |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2001 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions122 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time136 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $25.00. Not Applicable |
|
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $30.00. Not Applicable |
|
March 19, 2004 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( LOS ANGELES ) | |
March 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED. Not Applicable |
|
March 04, 2004 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( * ) | |
March 01, 2004 | Docket Event |
MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED. Not Applicable |
|
July 08, 2002 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
May 24, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
May 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
MSC STATEMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MATTER DISPOED BY JUDGMENT, NO FUTURE HEARINGS ON CALENDAR. Not Applicable |
|
May 13, 2002 | Docket Event |
SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.