Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Providian Nationalbank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mann Bracken, Llp, against Roger A Smith, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management142 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2001 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions22 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time22 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
March 01, 2002 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION VACATED |
|
January 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
VACATE CMC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/17/02 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S20. Not Applicable |
|
January 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER DISMISSALS AND TRANSFERS Not Applicable |
|
January 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED. Not Applicable |
|
January 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE ORDERED DISMISSED W/OUT PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. Not Applicable |
|
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/26/2001 OF PROVIDIAN NATIONALBANK Not Applicable |
|
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
FIRST APPEARANCE $93.00 PAID Not Applicable |
|
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S20 | |
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.