Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Le, Kimberly, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Cannonier, Heather M, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit List Scanned | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit List Scanned | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Case/Cause Taken Under Submission Decided | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Hohenwarter, Catherine |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | *Case/Cause Under Submission for Decision | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Lodged Document PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS LODGED FOR HEARING |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICES, SUB SERVED HEATHER CANNONIER WITH CLAIM AND ORDER ON 4/27/21 AND MAILD ON 4/27/21 FILED BY PET |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED HEATHER CANNONIER W/ PLTFF CLAIM AND ORDER ON 4/22/2021 |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.