Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Magallon, Reyna, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Public Storage, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Hohenwarter, Catherine presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Trial: Court
Date: June 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial: Court Judge: Hohenwarter, Catherine |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Hohenwarter, Catherine |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Minute Order *Trial: Court Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED PUBLIC STORAGE, SUSIE VANG, WITH SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AT TRIAL OR HEARING AND DECLARATION ON 5/17/2021 |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service BY PERSONAL SERVICE SERVED PUBLIC STORAGE WITH PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS ON 5/14/21 |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS Judge: Hohenwarter, Catherine |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL SENT TO REYNA MAGALLON |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granted ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Req for Postponement of Hearing after service (SC) BY PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.