Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Angelina, Vida Enterprise Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rudman T. Britt, against Styleminded, Telewise Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Nancy L. Newman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management182 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2018 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time365 days |
Complaint -
Date: August 21, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: August 21, 2018Notice of Case Assignment -
Date: August 21, 2018Summons -
Date: August 21, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 16, 2018Notice - Notice Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 14, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 14, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 14, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: February 19, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 16, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 25, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: June 25, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: June 25, 2019Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees
Date: June 25, 2019Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: June 25, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 25, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 26, 2019Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT
Date: August 21, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 21, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Judgment (Judgment)
Date: August 21, 2019Notice
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: August 21, 2019Notice (Notice of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: June 26, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice])
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.