Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kolahi Ray, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Grimm & Scholnick, against Contempo Floor Covering, Covering Contempo Floor, Je Higgins Lumber Company, Wood Flooring Distributors, represented by Koester & Beavers, Ruiz Felchlin Jardine Sinatra & Houstn, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with John L. Segal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Segal Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 17, 2005 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions58 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time142 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
in Department M Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
in Department M Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by JE HIGGINS LUMBER COMPANY (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Closed-ADR; Not held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior) - |
|
October 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding Closed-ADR (DANIEL MARTIN, MEDIATOR) - Not held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior Judge: ADR Neutral |
|
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court Makes Order) - |
|
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department WEC, John L. Segal, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Court Makes Order Judge: John L. Segal |
|
October 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by RAY KOLAHI (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.