Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Diversified Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dix, Lloyd Douglas, against Evans, Glenn, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rocky J. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryOther Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time3862 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 03/29/2012. | |
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | 03/02/2006: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITHOUT Prejudice filed | |
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/24/2006: Original Summons returned as to COMPLAINT of DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION | |
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/24/2006: Proof of Service (PERSONAL) of Summons and COMPLAINT of DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION served on GLENN EVANS with service date of 01/17/06 | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/30/2005: Track assignment: Economic | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/30/2005: Declaration re: Court Assignment filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.