Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Exclusive Atm Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Fi Presidential Barbershop, Marcelino Galvan, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Jared D. Beeson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJared D. Beeson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryBusiness Small Claims: $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant
Date: February 24, 2021Non-Settlement - Negotiation (ODR)
Date: March 29, 2021Small Claims Hearing
Date: May 05, 2021Other Post-Disposition Hearing
Date: August 10, 2022Small Claims Hearing
Date: April 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 | Hearing | Other Post-Disposition Hearing | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Master SC Minute Order Small Claims Hearing Judge: Beeson, Jared |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Small Claims Mediation Held | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Under Submission
Judge: Beeson, Jared |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Master SC Minute Order Small Claims Hearing Judge: Beeson, Jared |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
NonSettlementAgreement_03_29_2021_02_55_59_AM Non-Settlement - Negotiation (ODR) |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.