Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bangi, Cynthia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bangi, Teddy, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Gill, Susan M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGill, Susan M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions3511 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time3511 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2019 | Hearing | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
March 07, 2018 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
March 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P 635 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P 635 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
March 01, 2018 | Hearing | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170) | |
March 01, 2018 | Hearing | Appearance Stipulation and Waiver | |
March 01, 2018 | Hearing | Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
May 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference CONT'D FROM 3/23/17 Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference CONT'D FROM 3/23/17 Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
March 23, 2017 | Hearing |
Stipulation to Continue and Order OLD COURT DATE 03/23/2017 NEW COURT DATE 05/18/2017 Judge: Fielder, John L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.