Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Morales, Monica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Morales, Guillermo P, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with John L. Fielder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Fielder Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions402 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time402 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2009 | Hearing | Child Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU | |
August 27, 2009 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
August 27, 2009 | Hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS: 12/18/09 COMMISSIONER COMPTON |
|
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS: 12/18/09 COMMISSIONER COMPTON |
|
August 24, 2009 | Hearing | Judgm/Disso By Decl Granted | |
August 19, 2009 | Hearing | Request to Enter Default | |
August 19, 2009 | Hearing | Declaration for Default | |
August 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED DEFAULT VIA WE THE PEOPLE - FL 312 SIGNATURE MISSING; FL 180 #4N(3) NOT A PART OF SS |
|
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED DEFAULT VIA WE THE PEOPLE - FL 312 SIGNATURE MISSING; FL 180 #4N(3) NOT A PART OF SS |
|
June 18, 2009 | Hearing |
Proof of Publication WHAT PUBLISHED: PETITION SUMMONS PUBLICATION DATES: MAY 20, 27 JUNE 3,10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.