Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Summey, Denise M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Summey, Bryant, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Gill, Susan M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGill, Susan M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 16, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions575 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time3837 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause 12/3 COURTS OWN MOTION OSC TO VACATE NOTICE OF TRANSFER Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause 12/3 COURTS OWN MOTION OSC TO VACATE NOTICE OF TRANSFER Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
December 28, 2018 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
December 10, 2018 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
December 06, 2018 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF HEARING - RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: REGARDING NOTICE OF TRANSFER |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF HEARING - RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: REGARDING NOTICE OF TRANSFER |
|
December 03, 2018 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing HRG 1/15/2018 DIV C |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing HRG 1/15/2018 DIV C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.