Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aldridge, Karl Phillip, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Aldridge, Joanie, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Robert S. Tafoya presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Tafoya Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2001 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
Time To Trial188 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions455 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1743 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2006 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney ROBERT F CARBONE WITHDRAWS |
|
September 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney ROBERT F CARBONE WITHDRAWS |
|
September 26, 2006 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders AMENDED HEARING DATE 7/12/2006 JUDGE STALEY CCP635 |
|
September 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders AMENDED HEARING DATE 7/12/2006 JUDGE STALEY CCP635 |
|
August 24, 2006 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders HEARING DATE 7/12/2006 JUDGE COMPTON |
|
August 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders HEARING DATE 7/12/2006 JUDGE COMPTON |
|
July 12, 2006 | Hearing |
NP1085 Department: D Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CHILD VISITATION. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. KARL PHILLIP ALDRIDGE (PE-1) APPEARS WITH DONALD F BUTZ. JOANIE ALDRIDGE (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ROBERT F CARBONE ESQ. DAVID F LEON APPEARS FOR MINOR CHILD(REN). IN CHAMBERS CONFERENCE HELD. PARTIES STIPULATE TO WAIVE THE CLERK TAKING DOWN THE STIPULATION VERBATIM AND WILL RELY ON THE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT. STIPULATION, RECITED BY ATTORNEY BUTZ, INCLUDES THE FOLLOWING, HOLIDAY VISITATION, THANKSGIVING IS WITH THE RESPONDENT EACH YEAR, CHRISTMAS AND EASTER ARE DIVIDED. MOTHER'S DAY WEEKEND TO THE MOTHER. THE OFF TRACK SUMMER VACATION TIME BEGINNING 2007 IS OVERNIGHT WEDNESDAY TO THURSDAY. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: PETITIONER IS TO PAY $200 TO MINOR'S COUNSEL FOR FEES WITHIN 60 DAYS. ATTORNEY CARBONE IS TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
July 12, 2006 | Hearing |
4027 Review New Calendar |
|
July 12, 2006 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause REVIEW RE: C/V Judge: Staley, H. A. "Skip" |
|
July 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause REVIEW RE: C/V Judge: Staley, H. A. "Skip" |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.