Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dafs, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Hernandez, Jessi, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Dawn O. Bittleston presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDawn O. Bittleston Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2001 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions106 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Exhibit(s) List LIST OF DISPOSED EXHIBITS |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit(s) List LIST OF DISPOSED EXHIBITS |
|
July 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Notice 30 day notice sent to both parties |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice 30 day notice sent to both parties |
|
July 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Order for Destruction/Disposal Civil Exhibits
Judge: Dulcich, Judith K. |
|
February 21, 2019 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order FILED BY DCSS Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order FILED BY DCSS Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
February 20, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDER 1 MINOR Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDER 1 MINOR Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
December 17, 2018 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDER 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 02/20/19 Hearing Time: 08:00AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.