Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Miscellaneous-Civil (Bcm) case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etcheverry, Louis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2003 |
CategoryMiscellaneous-Civil (Bcm) |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time3897 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
December 05, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding-Entire (JBSIS) FILED BY LEONARD K. WELSH, ESQ |
|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding-Entire (JBSIS) FILED BY LEONARD K. WELSH, ESQ |
|
April 20, 2005 | Hearing |
NP1095 (THIRD PARTY) Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION. (THIRD PARTY) THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MARK ATKINS APPEARS FOR ALL PARTIES REQUESTING A CONTINUANCE. REQUEST IS GRANTED. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 5/16/2005 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 14 FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. |
|
April 20, 2005 | Hearing |
NP1095 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: PANDOL & SONS (PL-1) APPEARS BY E WARREN GUBLER. MARK ATKINS APPEARS FOR THIRD PARTY JUDGMENT DEBTOR. THIRD PARTY JUDGMENT DEBTOR REMAINS UNDER OATH. PARTIES ARE EXCUSED TO CONDUCT THE EXAM. |
|
April 20, 2005 | Hearing |
4082 Debtors Examination New Calendar |
|
April 20, 2005 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause CONTINUED FROM 4/5/2005 RE: STIPULATION Judge: Etcheverry, Louis P. |
|
April 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
NP1095 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: PANDOL & SONS (PL-1) APPEARS BY E WARREN GUBLER. MARK ATKINS APPEARS FOR THIRD PARTY JUDGMENT DEBTOR. THIRD PARTY JUDGMENT DEBTOR REMAINS UNDER OATH. PARTIES ARE EXCUSED TO CONDUCT THE EXAM. |
|
April 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
4082 Debtors Examination New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.