Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lallo, Ronald A, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Little, Leah, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Non, Fast Track presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNon, Fast Track Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2008 |
Category43-Ch Civil Harassment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1620 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: HARASSMENT. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RONALD A LALLO (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. LEAH LITTLE (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. DEFENDANT HAS FILED A CIVIL HARASSMENT WITH THE COURT ON 09/09/2008 AGAINST THE PLAINTIFF THE COURT FINDS SERVICE IS NOT TIMELY. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DROPPED. SUBJECT TO REISSUANCE ORDER. UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION THIS MATTER WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IF NO ACTION HAS BEEN TAKEN WITHIN 30 DAYS. |
|
September 10, 2008 | Hearing |
4072 OSC/Petition re: Harassment New Calendar |
|
September 10, 2008 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause NO PROOF OF SERVICE Judge: Errea, Larry A. |
|
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
NP1620 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: HARASSMENT. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RONALD A LALLO (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. LEAH LITTLE (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. DEFENDANT HAS FILED A CIVIL HARASSMENT WITH THE COURT ON 09/09/2008 AGAINST THE PLAINTIFF THE COURT FINDS SERVICE IS NOT TIMELY. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DROPPED. SUBJECT TO REISSUANCE ORDER. UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION THIS MATTER WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IF NO ACTION HAS BEEN TAKEN WITHIN 30 DAYS. |
|
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
4072 OSC/Petition re: Harassment New Calendar |
|
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause NO PROOF OF SERVICE Judge: Errea, Larry A. |
|
September 09, 2008 | Hearing | Answer to Request for Orders to Stop Harassment | |
August 25, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order (CH) NO TEMPORARY ORDERS ISSUED HEARING SET 9/10/08 @ 8:30 A.M. D-17 |
|
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order (CH) NO TEMPORARY ORDERS ISSUED HEARING SET 9/10/08 @ 8:30 A.M. D-17 |
|
August 23, 2008 | Hearing |
CONV New case created by deputy: 33 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.