Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Norcal Electric, Brian Mauro Construction Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Schroeder, Jeremy J, against Giamela, William M, Southmark Builders Inc, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChapin, Sidney P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2008 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time196 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal JEREMY J. SCHROEDER, ESQ. |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal JEREMY J. SCHROEDER, ESQ. |
|
October 08, 2008 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
October 02, 2008 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY JEREMY J. SCHROEDER, ESQ |
|
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY JEREMY J. SCHROEDER, ESQ |
|
September 24, 2008 | Hearing |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
September 22, 2008 | Hearing |
NP4170 Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JEREMY J SCHROEDER ESQ APPEARS ON BEHALF OF ALL NAMED PLAINTIFFS. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS. *************************************************************************************** CAUSE CONTINUED TO 10/8/2008 IN DEPARTMENT 4 AT 8:30 AM. REASON FOR NEXT APPEARANCE: PARTIES COMPLETING SETTLMENT. DISMISSAL TO BE FILED. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. |
|
September 22, 2008 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.