Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Abdou, Amal, Abdou, Gail, Abdou, Wafic, Abdou, Wafik, Bravin, Nancy, (total of 9) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Atkins, Todd C, against Cohen, Ira S, Ira S Cohen Inc, represented by Carrick, Patrick C, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChapin, Sidney P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management231 days |
Filing DateJune 02, 2004 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial546 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions399 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1422 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2007 | Hearing |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for ABDOU, AMAL (PL-1). Received from TODD C. ATKINS - 5/9/06. Receipt #352747 for amount of $20.00. |
|
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for ABDOU, AMAL (PL-1). Received from TODD C. ATKINS - 5/9/06. Receipt #352747 for amount of $20.00. |
|
November 06, 2007 | Hearing |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for ABDOU, AMAL (PL-1). Received from TODD C. ATKINS - 5/11/06. Receipt #351672 for amount of $20.00. |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for ABDOU, AMAL (PL-1). Received from TODD C. ATKINS - 5/11/06. Receipt #351672 for amount of $20.00. |
|
October 30, 2007 | Hearing |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for ABDOU, AMAL (PL-1). Received from TODD C. ATKINS - 2/21/06. Receipt #350057 for amount of $20.00. |
|
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for ABDOU, AMAL (PL-1). Received from TODD C. ATKINS - 2/21/06. Receipt #350057 for amount of $20.00. |
|
October 15, 2007 | Hearing |
172B Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 26830 Amount of $36.30 for WAFIK ABDOU, MD, INC (PL-18). Received from TODD C. ATKINS - 7/12/05. Receipt #346182 for amount of $36.30. |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
172B Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 26830 Amount of $36.30 for WAFIK ABDOU, MD, INC (PL-18). Received from TODD C. ATKINS - 7/12/05. Receipt #346182 for amount of $36.30. |
|
October 02, 2007 | Hearing |
866 Pmt: Continuance of Trial GC 26830(D) (8/17/03) Amount of $110.00 for WAFIK ABDOU, MD, INC (PL-18). Received from TODD C. ATKINS - 3/9/05. Receipt #343665 for amount of $146.30. |
|
October 02, 2007 | Hearing |
172B Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 26830 Amount of $36.30 for WAFIK ABDOU, MD, INC (PL-18). Received from TODD C. ATKINS - 3/9/05. Receipt #343665 for amount of $146.30. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.