Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cashcall Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Quiroz, Claudia B, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims - More Than 12 Claims Within 12 Months |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1572 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Cycle Time3318 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 ISSUED 9/14/15 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES |
|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 ISSUED 9/14/15 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES |
|
February 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction RETURNED VIA SASE |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction RETURNED VIA SASE |
|
September 14, 2015 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued LOS ANGELES COUNTY RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E |
|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued LOS ANGELES COUNTY RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E |
|
September 08, 2015 | Hearing | Memorandum of Costs | |
November 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys KENNETH J. MIELE |
|
November 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Judgment Assigned NO COPY RECEIVED |
|
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment Assigned NO COPY RECEIVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.