Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brooks, James, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Wollitz, Mimi, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims - 1,500 Or Less |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time1488 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2012 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied AS TO MIMI WOLITZ |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied AS TO MIMI WOLITZ |
|
April 23, 2010 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
August 05, 2008 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for BROOKS, JAMES DBA APPROVED AUTOS (PL-1). Received from APPROVED AUTOS, check no(s) 2320. Receipt #402305 for amount of $15.00. |
|
August 05, 2008 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/MONEY/BAS |
|
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/MONEY/BAS |
|
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for BROOKS, JAMES DBA APPROVED AUTOS (PL-1). Received from APPROVED AUTOS, check no(s) 2320. Receipt #402305 for amount of $15.00. |
|
July 18, 2008 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties | |
July 02, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR PRINCIPAL $1080.00 COSTS $65.00 PLUS CANCELLED PROMISSORY NOTE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.