Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Herbert P Sears Co Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sims, Ronald S, against Oak Tree Affiliates Inc A California Corporation, represented by Stacey, Sherman L, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management419 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Time To Trial558 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2682 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2016 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
August 12, 2010 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated DISMISSAL FILED ~ calid=1307206 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4170, CourtDate:08/12/2010, Courtroom:14, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:7, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:heatherj, SystemDate:7/13/2010 8:35:00 AM |
|
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated DISMISSAL FILED ~ calid=1307206 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4170, CourtDate:08/12/2010, Courtroom:14, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:7, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:heatherj, SystemDate:7/13/2010 8:35:00 AM |
|
August 03, 2010 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
August 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
July 12, 2010 | Hearing |
NP1711 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: COURT TRIAL/CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR TRIAL BY COURT WITH COUNSEL AND PARTIES PRESENT IN OPEN COURT AS FOLLOWS: HERBERT P SEARS CO INC (PL-1) APPEARS BY RONALD S SIMS. OAK TREE AFFILIATES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (DE-1) APPEARS BY SHERMAN L STACEY. *************************************************************************************** IN CHAMBERS CONFERENCE HELD. SETTLEMENT REACHED. PARTIES STIPULATE TO THE USE OF VOICE IQ PARTIES STIPULATE TO WAIVE THE CLERK TAKING DOWN THE STIPULATION VERBATIM AND WILL RELY ON THE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT. SETTLEMENT REACHED AS FOLLOWS: AS RECITED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT SHERMAN STACEY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO ENTER INTO THIS AGREEMENT ALONG WITH PARTIES SWORN ERIN MOSESIAN AND JIM STERNER (PLAINTIFF'S). THE DEFENDANT WILL PAY TO PLAINTIFF'S THE AMOUNT OF $10,000.00 WITHIN (10) DAYS TO BE PAID TO COUNSEL FOR HERBERT P. SEARS. THEN PLAINTIFF WILL FILE A DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND PROVIDE A COPY TO COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 8/12/2010 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 14 UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
July 12, 2010 | Hearing |
4147 Court Trial/Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
July 12, 2010 | Hearing |
Court Trial T⁄E 2 DAYS Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
NP1711 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: COURT TRIAL/CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR TRIAL BY COURT WITH COUNSEL AND PARTIES PRESENT IN OPEN COURT AS FOLLOWS: HERBERT P SEARS CO INC (PL-1) APPEARS BY RONALD S SIMS. OAK TREE AFFILIATES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (DE-1) APPEARS BY SHERMAN L STACEY. *************************************************************************************** IN CHAMBERS CONFERENCE HELD. SETTLEMENT REACHED. PARTIES STIPULATE TO THE USE OF VOICE IQ PARTIES STIPULATE TO WAIVE THE CLERK TAKING DOWN THE STIPULATION VERBATIM AND WILL RELY ON THE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT. SETTLEMENT REACHED AS FOLLOWS: AS RECITED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT SHERMAN STACEY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO ENTER INTO THIS AGREEMENT ALONG WITH PARTIES SWORN ERIN MOSESIAN AND JIM STERNER (PLAINTIFF'S). THE DEFENDANT WILL PAY TO PLAINTIFF'S THE AMOUNT OF $10,000.00 WITHIN (10) DAYS TO BE PAID TO COUNSEL FOR HERBERT P. SEARS. THEN PLAINTIFF WILL FILE A DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND PROVIDE A COPY TO COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 8/12/2010 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 14 UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
4147 Court Trial/Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.