Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Professional Collection Consultants, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Wu, Scott D, against Williams, Erin, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 23, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions219 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2968 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 County of Kern |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 County of Kern |
|
March 26, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
August 18, 2011 | Hearing | Writ Returned Partially Satisfied | |
June 29, 2009 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
June 09, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1765 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION ERIN WILLIAMS. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. ERIN WILLIAMS (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DETERMINING THE CLAIM OF EXEMPTION OF ERIN WILLIAMS WAS HEARD ON 06/09/09 . THE COURT CONSIDERED THE EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF AND IN OPPOSITION TO THE CLAIM OF EXEMPTION JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IS DENIED IN PART, GRANTED IN PART. LEVYING OFFICER SHALL WITHHOLD $50.00 PER PAY PERIOD COMMENCING 7/31/2009 AND MONTHLY THEREAFTER UNTIL PAID IN FULL. LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY MONIES HELD AS FOLLOWS: $100.00 TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR AND THE REMAINING BALANCE TO DEFENDANT IF ANY LESS ANY FEES. LEVY NUMBER 2009086785. THE CLERK SHALL TRANSMIT A CERTIFIED COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE LEVYING OFFICER. THE LEVYING OFFICER SHALL NOTIFY THE EMPLOYER OF ANY CHANGE IN THE EARNINGS WITHHOLDING ORDER AND RELEASE ANY RETAINED SUMS AS PROVIDED IN THIS ORDER. CERTIFIED COPY OF THE ORDER TO THE SHERIFF. COPY OF THE ORDER TO NAMED PARTIES. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
June 09, 2009 | Hearing |
4122 Claim of Exemption New Calendar |
|
June 09, 2009 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause FILED: MAY 12, 2009 DEFT ERIN WILLIAMS LEVY # 2009076785 (K.C.S.O.) Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.