Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D, against Munoz, Dominic M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management142 days |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions248 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2432 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
September 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED |
|
July 06, 2009 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
March 27, 2009 | Hearing |
Order Dismissing Action (Full) Edit Notice |
|
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action (Full) Edit Notice |
|
March 19, 2009 | Hearing |
NP4170 PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: HEATHER IJAMES MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR MARK D WALSH ON BEHALF OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CRC 664.6 |
|
March 19, 2009 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.