Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Financial Credit Network, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gubler, E Warren, against Hutchins, Marty V, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 28, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions111 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2876 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2016 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied County of Kern. |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied County of Kern. |
|
December 22, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
June 06, 2013 | Hearing |
Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction AS TO MARTY V HUTCHINS |
|
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction AS TO MARTY V HUTCHINS |
|
March 23, 2012 | Hearing |
Order Determining Claim of Exemption IT IS ORDERED THE JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IS DENIED. THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY EARNING HELD TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT ON THE JUDGMENT. **ETIENNE** (PRO PER UNDER "GUBLER" |
|
March 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Determining Claim of Exemption IT IS ORDERED THE JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IS DENIED. THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY EARNING HELD TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT ON THE JUDGMENT. **ETIENNE** (PRO PER UNDER "GUBLER" |
|
March 14, 2012 | Hearing |
NP1765 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION AS TO MARTY V. HUTCHINS HEARING AFTER TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL OF RECORD MARTY V HUTCHINS (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DETERMINING THE CLAIM OF EXEMPTION OF MARTY V. HUTCHINS WAS HEARD ON 03/14/2012 . THE COURT CONSIDERED THE EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF AND IN OPPOSITION TO THE CLAIM OF EXEMPTION LEVY NUMBER 2011099945. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IS DENIED. THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY MONIES HELD TO THE PLAINTIFF-FINANCIAL CREDIT NETWORK, INC. FOR PAYMENT OF THE JUDGMENT. THE CLERK SHALL TRANSMIT A CERTIFIED COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE LEVYING OFFICER. THE LEVYING OFFICER SHALL NOTIFY THE EMPLOYER OF ANY CHANGE IN THE EARNINGS WITHHOLDING ORDER AND RELEASE ANY RETAINED SUMS AS PROVIDED IN THIS ORDER. CERTIFIED COPY OF THE ORDER TO THE SHERIFF. COPY OF THE ORDER TO NAMED PARTIES. KERN COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, CIVIL SECTION, 1600 E. BELLE TERRACE #2, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93307 ORDER IS SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW AND SIGNATURE. |
|
March 14, 2012 | Hearing |
4122 Claim of Exemption Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: AS TO MARTY V. HUTCHYINS LEVY NUMBER 2011099945 KERN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE HOLDING $536.74 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.