Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Actis, Betty, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Dunbar, Diane, Colbert, Jerry, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2004 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2012 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 03, 2004 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
February 24, 2004 | Hearing |
115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 Amount of $7.00 for ACTIS, BETTY (PL-1). Received from KEPHART, check no(s) 4389. Receipt #80049 for amount of $7.00. |
|
February 24, 2004 | Docket Event |
115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 Amount of $7.00 for ACTIS, BETTY (PL-1). Received from KEPHART, check no(s) 4389. Receipt #80049 for amount of $7.00. |
|
February 18, 2004 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Issued | |
February 02, 2004 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties | |
January 29, 2004 | Hearing |
Judgment After Hearing JUDGMENT FOR: BETTY ACTIS JUDGMENT AGAINST:DIANE DUNBAR RENT & RENTAL DAMAGES -WAIVED COSTS $ 173.30 TOTAL $ 173.30 |
|
January 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Judgment After Hearing JUDGMENT FOR: BETTY ACTIS JUDGMENT AGAINST:DIANE DUNBAR RENT & RENTAL DAMAGES -WAIVED COSTS $ 173.30 TOTAL $ 173.30 |
|
January 26, 2004 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 5 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: BETTY ACTIS (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT DIANE DUNBAR NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT JERRY COLBERT - DISMISSED PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ETIENNE ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF, AGAINST DEFENDANT DIANE DUNBAR ONLY, RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES $WAIVED, COSTS $173.30, ATTORNEY FEES $0.00, MISC FEES $0.00 FOR A TOTAL OF $173.30. RESTITUTION OF PREMISES. WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT. COURT TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. EXHIBITS RETURNED TO OFFERING PARTY ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):1637;1935 TAPE B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.