Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Billy Burns, Linda Burns, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2020 |
CategoryProbate-Roseville |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | S-PR-0010492 Guardianship of Mason, Naylani Marie Annual Review Hearing No appearance is required. A new annual review hearing is recommended to be set for December 6, 2024 at 1:31 p.m. in Department ... | |
December 11, 2020 | Not Heard: Vacated (513210) | ||
December 11, 2020 | Heard: Orders Made | ||
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Assesment Waived | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Letters Guardianship | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian of the Person | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
October 30, 2020 | Heard: Continued by Court | ||
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.