Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Robert Cardines, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Alina Corpus, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Support-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Stipulation and Order | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Motion | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Re Payment of Support (DCSS IN) | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement for Registration of California Support Order (DCSS) | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Registration of California Support Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.