Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Santa Clara, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Eduardo Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Support-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Stipulation and Order | |
October 07, 2021 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Order After Hearing | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Order After Hearing | |
June 09, 2021 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Order After Hearing | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Motion | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Re Payment of Support (DCSS IN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.