Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tamara Bloomberg, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Philip Bloomberg, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2022 | |||
May 20, 2022 | |||
December 03, 2021 | |||
November 29, 2021 | |||
November 12, 2021 | |||
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Ntc Re Mediation/Orientation | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appoint Child Custody Mediator Tier I | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Orientation completed by respondent | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Mediation Orientation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.