Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dana Jacques, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Daniel Jacques, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2020 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2022 | |||
December 01, 2021 | |||
November 05, 2021 | |||
November 02, 2021 | |||
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Electronic Service | |
October 15, 2021 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
October 15, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
October 14, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.