Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sarah Reilly, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Patrick Reilly, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2020 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
October 04, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
September 24, 2021 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
September 24, 2021 | Dropped From Calendar: Failure to | ||
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Entry of Judgment | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Temp Judge | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
September 17, 2021 | State of Emergency | ||
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice – Continuance due to State of Emergency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.