Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pierceton Roe, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Landry Salami, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0046365 Roe, Pierceton vs. Salami, Landry Motion for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff Tammy Salami moves for a preliminary injunction enjoining defendant Landry Salami from accessing proceeds fro... | |
July 06, 2021 | |||
April 08, 2021 | |||
April 07, 2021 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Supplemental | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Support | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Presiding Judge | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Case Management Conference | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.