Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
James Garvin, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Allan Guttman, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | |||
April 20, 2021 | Calendar Notes Adopted | ||
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | General Denial | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof Service- Summons | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Case Management Conference | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.