We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Miguel, Michael ,
filed a(n)
Guardianship,Conservatorship -
Probate
case
in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
This case was filed in
Alameda County
Superior Courts
with Sandra K. Bean presiding.
Filing Date
April 01, 2021
Category
Conservatorship - Person
Last Refreshed
July 16, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Other Parties
Miguel, Brandon (Conservatee)
Williams, Richard L. (Attorney)
Case Events for
Miguel, Michael v.
Date
Type
Description
July 15, 2021
Judge: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Person
July 15, 2021
Docket Event
Michael Miguel Appointed Conservator
July 15, 2021
Docket Event
Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Person Granted
July 15, 2021
Docket Event
Probate 12/16/2021 11:00 AM D- 202
July 15, 2021
Docket Event
Probate 10/05/2022 10:45 AM D- 202
July 15, 2021
Docket Event
Conservatorship Hearing Commenced and Completed
July 15, 2021
Docket Event
Order Appointing Probate Conservator Michael Miguel Filed
July 14, 2021
Docket Event
Assessment and Order for Court Investigator Filed
July 14, 2021
Docket Event
Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Conservator (limited; updated) - hearing on 7/15/21
Get Document
July 13, 2021
Docket Event
Proposed Order Received
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.