Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Colbert, Sandra, Colbert, Ralph, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Sandra K. Bean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra K. Bean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryGuardian Of Minor - Person |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian Hearing 7/13/2021
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian Hearing 8/31/2021
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian Updated- Hearing 7/13/2021
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2022 |
Judge: Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person |
||
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters of Guardianship Filed | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian of Minor Sandra Colbert, Ralph Colbert Filed | |
August 31, 2021 |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Guardianship Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Sandra Colbert, Ralph Colbert Appointed Guardian | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Probate 11/02/2022 10:45 AM D- 202 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person Granted | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian of Minor Sandra Colbert, Ralph Colbert Filed | |
August 31, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.