Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alameda County Public Guardian- Conservator, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Sandra K. Bean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra K. Bean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship - Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Conservator Updated Notes- Hearing 7/15/2021
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Conservator Hearing 7/15/2021
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Estate |
||
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Probate Non-Jury Trial dept: 202 date: 10/22/2021 time: 09:30 AM | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Probate dept: 202 date: 10/22/2021 time: 10:00 AM | |
October 08, 2021 |
Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Estate
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Hearing Commenced and Continued | |
October 08, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Estate |
||
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Capacity Declaration - Conservatorship | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Probate Non-Jury Trial dept: 202 date: 10/08/2021 time: 09:30 AM | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Probate Non-Jury Trial 09/03/2021 09:30 AM D- 202 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.