Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mclean, Donald L., filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ruben Sundeen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2018 |
CategoryLetters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate on 3/26/18
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party : Donald M. McLean Filed
Date: April 22, 2019Petition for Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Waiver of Bond Filed
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to Filed
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Supplement to Petition for Final Distribution Filed
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Creditor's Claims For $55,827.28 from Bank of America, N. A. Filed
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Petition for Final Distribution Filed by Donald L. McLean
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Decree Final Discharge Filed
Date: May 01, 2019Inventory and Appraisal - Final Filed
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Distribution on 2/06/2019
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Final Distribution Filed
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 06, 2019Request Re: Executor Request Discharge Filed for Donald L. McLean
Date: April 22, 2019Waiver of Notice of Petition to Adminidter Estate Filed
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Administrator Filed
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Satisfaction and Release of Claim Filed by Bank of America, N.A.
Date: October 09, 2020Declaration in Support of Petition for Final Distribution Filed
Date: January 30, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Order Approving Final Distribution - Waiver of Accounting Filed
Date: February 06, 2019Receipt on Distribution by Party : Ann McLean Filed
Date: April 22, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.