We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tekeste, Tewolde ,
filed a(n)
General Probate -
Probate
case
in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
This case was filed in
Alameda County
Superior Courts
with Carl W. Morris presiding.
Filing Date
January 08, 2008
Category
Compromise Of Minor'S Claim
Last Refreshed
November 02, 2020
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Matter Type
General Probate
Other Parties
Tekeste, Yonathan (Minor)
Wang, Clifford Y (Attorney)
Case Events for
Tekeste, Tewolde v.
Date
Type
Description
February 11, 2008
Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim
Judge: Carl W. Morris
February 11, 2008
Docket Event
Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim Granted
February 11, 2008
Docket Event
Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim Filed
February 11, 2008
Docket Event
Declaration Filed
February 11, 2008
Docket Event
Minor's Compromise Hearing Commenced and Completed
February 04, 2008
Docket Event
Examiner's Notes re Minor's Comp. on 2/11/2008
Get Document
January 30, 2008
Docket Event
Amendment to Petition Filed
January 10, 2008
Docket Event
Amendment to Petition Filed
January 08, 2008
Docket Event
Probate 02/11/2008 11:00 AM D- 201
January 08, 2008
Docket Event
Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim Filed
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.