Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mario Rubio, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate case against California Department Of Motor Vehicles, California Department Of Motorvehicles, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Daniel A. Ottolia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel A. Ottolia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
|
Respondent DMV's points and authorities in opposition to petition for writ of mandate
Date: January 08, 2021Notice of ruling
Date: January 27, 2021Minute Order: Court Trial - Short Cause
Date: January 22, 2021Legacy Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandamus (Mandate).
Date: October 08, 2020System Generated Notice re: Notice of Status Conference.
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandamus (Mandate).
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Return to Petition for Writ of Mandate filed
Date: October 27, 2020Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Mandate) filed. (Riverside)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Judgment after hearing
Date: March 26, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.