Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank Trust Na, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Naiman Law Group, against Ashley Barrett, Chelsea Barrett, Delaney Barrett, Brianna Barrett, Stephanie Barrett, (total of 6) See All represented by Unrepresented, The Barrett Law Office, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with David E. Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 10, 2018 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer-Residential Under $10K (Ri)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time145 days |
CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: November 16, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/10/2018 OF US BANK TRUST NA AND FILED.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 9/07/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 11
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00DECLARATION OF RANDALL D NAIMAN IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00ORDER SETTING ASIDE SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER AND JUDGMENT ENTERED OCTOBER 18 2018
Date: October 30, 2018APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO VACATE SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER AND JUDGMENT
Date: October 30, 2018DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: November 16, 2018OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY RICHARD L BARRETT FILED
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF/TO MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED.
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92508.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00HEARING ON DEMURRER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 9/17/18 AT 13:00 IN DEPT. 11 (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00DECLARATION OF E RATLIFF IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY US BANK TRUST NA
Date: October 26, 2018HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 10/09/18 AT 8:00 IN CLER
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00PLTFS SEP STMT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVID OF MSJ
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR ADVANCE HEARING ON DEMURRER BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: APPLICATION AND ORDER FEE SUBMITTED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: December 27, 2018WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED
Date: December 05, 2018ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY.
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.